KS HB2317 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Assessment and Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Assessment and Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Substitute for HB 2317 by Committee on Assessment and Taxation - Providing a sales tax exemption for sales of over-the-counter drugs.
Title
Senate Substitute for HB 2317 by Committee on Assessment and Taxation - Providing a sales tax exemption for sales of over-the-counter drugs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-29 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 123 Nay: 1 (Y: 123 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, January 24, 2024, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2023-04-03 | House | House Engrossed on Thursday, March 30, 2023 |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2023-03-29 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 123 Nay: 1 |
2023-03-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2023-03-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2023-03-13 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Taxation |
2023-03-02 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 2, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2023-02-07 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2023-02-07 | House | House Introduced |