KS HB2349 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-05 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-05 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a mechanism to seek relief from the Kansas offender registration act requirements, decreasing criminal penalties for failure to register, allowing courts to waive fees associated with registration, reducing number of places a person is required to register and eliminating registration for most juvenile adjudications.
Title
Creating a mechanism to seek relief from the Kansas offender registration act requirements, decreasing criminal penalties for failure to register, allowing courts to waive fees associated with registration, reducing number of places a person is required to register and eliminating registration for most juvenile adjudications.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2021-02-26 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2021-02-22 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 22, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 546-S |
2021-02-10 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2021-02-10 | House | House Introduced |