KS HB2416 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute for HB 2416 by House Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development - Enacting the Kansas targeted employment act to provide tax credits for the employment of persons with developmental disabilities.
Title
Substitute for HB 2416 by House Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development - Enacting the Kansas targeted employment act to provide tax credits for the employment of persons with developmental disabilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died on Calendar |
2020-03-12 | House | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2020-03-04 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2020-02-26 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-06 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 6, 2020, 1:30 PM Room 112-N |
2020-01-27 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Taxation; Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2019-04-04 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2019-04-04 | House | House Introduced |