KS HB2419 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amendments regarding the licensure and regulation of barbering, including licensure fee amounts.
Title
Amendments regarding the licensure and regulation of barbering, including licensure fee amounts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died on Calendar |
2022-03-11 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be further amended and be passed as amended by Committee on General Government Budget |
2022-02-23 | House | House Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on General Government Budget |
2021-03-16 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on General Government Budget |
2021-03-10 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 10, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 281-N |
2021-02-23 | House | House Referred to Committee on General Government Budget |
2021-02-23 | House | House Introduced |