KS HB2422 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for a sales tax exemption for the make-a-wish foundation of Kansas.
Title
Providing for a sales tax exemption for the make-a-wish foundation of Kansas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died in Committee |
2017-05-10 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, May 10, 2017, 03:30 PM Room 346-S |
2017-05-02 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2017-05-02 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hb2422/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2422_00_0000.pdf |