KS HB2467 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the production of hard cider by microbreweries.
Title
Authorizing the production of hard cider by microbreweries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-10 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 118 Nay: 5 (Y: 118 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 16, 2016, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2016-02-10 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 118 Nay: 5 |
2016-02-10 | House | House Engrossed on Tuesday, February 09 , 2016 |
2016-02-09 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2016-02-09 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Frownfelter was rejected |
2016-02-09 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Frownfelter |
2016-02-09 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2016-01-28 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2016-01-19 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, January 21, 2016, 9:00 AM Room 346-S |
2016-01-14 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2016-01-14 | House | House Introduced |