KS HB2527 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removing sunset provisions for closed sessions and privileged records regarding trauma cases.
Title
Removing sunset provisions for closed sessions and privileged records regarding trauma cases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died on Calendar |
2020-03-13 | House | House Withdrawn from Consent Calendar and placed on General Orders |
2020-03-12 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2020-03-04 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Rural Revitalization |
2020-02-26 | House | House Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-17 | House | House Withdrawn from Consent Calendar and placed on General Orders |
2020-02-12 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2020-02-04 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 4, 2020, 9:00 AM Room 281-N |
2020-02-04 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 4, 2020, 9:00 AM Room 582-N - CANCELED |
2020-01-29 | House | House Referred to Committee on Rural Revitalization |
2020-01-29 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2527/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2527_00_0000.pdf |