KS HB2575 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died on Senate General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died on Senate General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the Kansas drycleaner environmental response act to change the required deductible rate, environmental surcharge rate and penalty fine amount.
Title
Amending the Kansas drycleaner environmental response act to change the required deductible rate, environmental surcharge rate and penalty fine amount.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 95 Nay: 29 (Y: 95 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died on Senate General Orders |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, March 16, 2020, 8:30 AM Room 159-S |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2020-03-04 | House | House Engrossed on Thursday, February 27, 2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 95 Nay: 29 |
2020-02-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2020-02-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2020-02-24 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Agriculture |
2020-02-17 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 17, 2020, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2020-02-07 | House | House Referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2020-02-06 | House | House Introduced |