KS HB2669 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 19, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 19, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Codifying the mental health intervention team program administered by the Kansas department for aging and disability services in state statute.
Title
Codifying the mental health intervention team program administered by the Kansas department for aging and disability services in state statute.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 101 Nay: 18 (Y: 101 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 19, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 144-S |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Education |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2024-02-28 | House | House Engrossed on Monday, February 26, 2024 |
2024-02-22 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 101 Nay: 18 |
2024-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2024-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2024-02-20 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Health and Human Services |
2024-02-08 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 8, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 112-N |
2024-02-01 | House | House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2024-02-01 | House | House Introduced |