KS HB2717 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Registration of operators of assisted living, residential health care, home plus or adult day care facilities.
Title
Registration of operators of assisted living, residential health care, home plus or adult day care facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 114 Nay: 9 (Y: 114 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2014-03-26 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 114 Nay: 9 |
2014-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2014-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole -- Amendment by Rep. O'Brien was adopted. |
2014-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative O'Brien |
2014-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2014-03-11 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2014-03-05 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Taxation; Rereferred to Committee on Children and Seniors |
2014-02-27 | House | House Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2014-02-26 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2014-02-19 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 25, 2014, 9:00 AM Room 218-N |
2014-02-14 | House | House Referred to Committee on Children and Seniors |
2014-02-14 | House | House Introduced |