KS HB2794 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a sales tax exemption for purchases of personal property and services, sales of personal property and purchases by contractors for not-for-profit animal shelters and rescue network managers licensed under the Kansas pet animal act.
Title
Providing a sales tax exemption for purchases of personal property and services, sales of personal property and purchases by contractors for not-for-profit animal shelters and rescue network managers licensed under the Kansas pet animal act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Taxation |
2024-02-20 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 20, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2024-02-09 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2024-02-09 | House | House Introduced |