KS SB189 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for an increase in registration fees for electric and hybrid vehicles.
Title
Providing for an increase in registration fees for electric and hybrid vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Hearing continuation: Friday, March 15, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 546-S |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 12, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 546-S |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 7, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 546-S - CANCELED |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/sb189/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb189_00_0000.pdf |