KS SB22 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-25 - Senate Hearing: Wednesday, January 25, 2023, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
Pending: Senate Assessment and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-25 - Senate Hearing: Wednesday, January 25, 2023, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
Pending: Senate Assessment and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a sales tax exemption for certain purchases and sales by the Johnson county Christmas bureau association.
Title
Providing a sales tax exemption for certain purchases and sales by the Johnson county Christmas bureau association.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-25 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, January 25, 2023, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Senate Introduced |