KS SB255 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 22, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 22, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring school districts to provide separate accommodations for students of each biological sex on overnight school sponsored trips.
Title
Requiring school districts to provide separate accommodations for students of each biological sex on overnight school sponsored trips.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 22, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 144-S |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Education |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Senate Introduced |