KS SB264 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for notice and opportunity to be heard before removal of person from county appraiser eligibility list and for notification when person no longer holds office of appraiser.
Title
Providing for notice and opportunity to be heard before removal of person from county appraiser eligibility list and for notification when person no longer holds office of appraiser.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2020-03-18 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 18, 2020, 3:30 PM Room 112-N - CANCELED |
2020-03-04 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2020-03-04 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Alley was adopted |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Alley |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, January 22, 2020, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senate Introduced |