KS SB274 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-15 - Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 15, 2023, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
Pending: Senate Assessment and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-15 - Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 15, 2023, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
Pending: Senate Assessment and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the use of the cost approach for special purpose property for property tax valuation purposes.
Title
Requiring the use of the cost approach for special purpose property for property tax valuation purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-15 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 15, 2023, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate Introduced |