KS SB468 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting cities and counties that grant or approve certain property tax exemptions or tax increment financing from exceeding their revenue neutral rates for property tax purposes.
Title
Prohibiting cities and counties that grant or approve certain property tax exemptions or tax increment financing from exceeding their revenue neutral rates for property tax purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 14, 2024, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate Introduced |