KS SB485 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-19 - Senate Hearing: Monday, February 19, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 144-S - CANCELED
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-19 - Senate Hearing: Monday, February 19, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 144-S - CANCELED
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing students attending public schools with low proficiency scores and certain private elementary and secondary school students to participate in the tax credit for low income students scholarship program.
Title
Authorizing students attending public schools with low proficiency scores and certain private elementary and secondary school students to participate in the tax credit for low income students scholarship program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, February 19, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 144-S - CANCELED |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Education |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Senate Introduced |