KS SB71 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-15 - Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 15, 2023, 8:30 AM Room 144-S
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-15 - Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 15, 2023, 8:30 AM Room 144-S
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the secretary of agriculture to establish a division of sustainable agriculture that shall apply for federal grant funds under the greenhouse gas reduction fund to assist farmers in converting to renewable energy and sustainable agriculture practices.
Title
Requiring the secretary of agriculture to establish a division of sustainable agriculture that shall apply for federal grant funds under the greenhouse gas reduction fund to assist farmers in converting to renewable energy and sustainable agriculture practices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-15 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 15, 2023, 8:30 AM Room 144-S |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Senate Introduced |