KS SB80 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Senate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
Pending: Senate Assessment and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Senate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
Pending: Senate Assessment and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Excluding social security payments from household income and increasing the appraised value threshold for eligibility of seniors and disabled veterans related to increased property tax homestead claims.
Title
Excluding social security payments from household income and increasing the appraised value threshold for eligibility of seniors and disabled veterans related to increased property tax homestead claims.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, January 31, 2023, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Senate Introduced |