KS SR1737 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Senate Enrolled on Friday, February 16, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Senate Enrolled on Friday, February 16, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Affirming Texas Governor, Greg Abbott's right to defend the state of Texas from unrestrained illegal immigration.
Title
Affirming Texas Governor, Greg Abbott's right to defend the state of Texas from unrestrained illegal immigration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Adopted - Yea: 26 Nay: 11 (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Sykes was rejected - Yea: 11 Nay: 29 (Y: 11 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Sykes was rejected - Yea: 11 Nay: 29 (Y: 11 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-16 | Senate | Senate Enrolled on Friday, February 16, 2024 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Adopted; Yea: 26 Nay: 11 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be adopted |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Sykes was rejected Yea: 11 Nay: 29 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Sykes |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Senate Introduced |