KY HB114 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 118.367 to change the deadline for filing a statement-of-candidacy form from April 1 to the last Tuesday in January.
Title
AN ACT relating to elections and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House: Adopt SCA 1 RCS# 348 (Y: 56 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 347 (Y: 56 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House: Adopt HFA 2 RCS# 346 (Y: 42 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2019-03-14 - House - House: Concur SFA 1 RCS# 345 (Y: 57 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House: Concur SCS 1 RCS# 344 (Y: 55 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House: Consider Motion SCS 1 RCS# 343 (Y: 59 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1, sfa 1, scta 1 RSN# 941 (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 32 (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 347 (Y: 56 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House: Adopt HFA 2 RCS# 346 (Y: 42 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2019-03-14 - House - House: Concur SFA 1 RCS# 345 (Y: 57 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House: Concur SCS 1 RCS# 344 (Y: 55 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House: Consider Motion SCS 1 RCS# 343 (Y: 59 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1, sfa 1, scta 1 RSN# 941 (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 32 (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | House | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 023) |
2019-03-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-14 | House | passed 56-39 |
2019-03-14 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1), floor amendment (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2019-03-14 | House | floor amendment (2) defeated |
2019-03-13 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Senate floor amendment (1), floor amendment (2) filed to Senate committee substitute, and floor amendment (3-title) filed to bill |
2019-03-13 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1), floor amendment (1), and committee amendment (1-title) |
2019-03-12 | House | to Rules (H) |
2019-03-12 | House | received in House |
2019-03-12 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 27-9 with Committee Substitute (1), floor amendment (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2019-03-07 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2019-03-07 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | 1st reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-02-13 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-2 |
2019-02-12 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 13, 2019 |
2019-02-12 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-11 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2019-02-06 | House | posted in committee |
2019-01-10 | House | to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) |
2019-01-08 | House | introduced in House |