KY HB172 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 70)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 70)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 317.450 to authorize the board to issue a license to operate a school of barbering to any person, firm, or corporation that has provided sufficient evidence that a sufficient number of licensed teachers will be employed, with at least one teacher with a minimum of 12 months experience teaching in a barber school that includes administrative experience.
Title
AN ACT relating to barbering.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Clines [R] | Rep. DJ Johnson [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2664 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 70 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 70 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 70) |
2023-03-16 | House | delivered to Governor |
2023-03-16 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2023-03-16 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2023-03-16 | House | received in House |
2023-03-16 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 34-0 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 16, 2023 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2023-03-14 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2023-03-03 | Senate | to Licensing & Occupations (S) |
2023-02-23 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2023-02-23 | Senate | received in Senate |
2023-02-22 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 |
2023-02-16 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 17, 2023 |
2023-02-16 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2023-02-15 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2023-02-09 | House | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (H) |
2023-02-07 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-02-07 | House | introduced in House |