KY HB178 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-08 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-08 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 422.285 and 17.176 to expand the availability of post-conviction DNA testing.
Title
AN ACT relating to DNA.
Sponsors
Rep. Linda Belcher [D] | Rep. Johnny Bell [D] | Rep. Joni Jenkins [D] | Rep. Reginald Meeks [D] |
Rep. Jody Richards [D] | Rep. Jim Wayne [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-08 | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2012-02-02 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-02-01 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2012-01-30 | posted in committee | |
2012-01-04 | to Judiciary (H) | |
2012-01-03 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB178.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB178/bill.doc |