KY HB205 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 85)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 85)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Designate Ale-8-One as the official Kentucky original soft drink.
Title
AN ACT designating Ale-8-One as the official Kentucky original soft drink.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-22 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 85) |
2013-03-12 | House | delivered to Governor |
2013-03-12 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2013-03-12 | House | received in House |
2013-03-07 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2013 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill |
2013-03-05 | Senate | returned to Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S) |
2013-03-05 | Senate | 1st reading |
2013-03-05 | Senate | taken from Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S) |
2013-03-04 | Senate | to Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S) |
2013-02-27 | Senate | received in Senate |
2013-02-26 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2013-02-22 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 26, 2013 |
2013-02-22 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-21 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2013-02-12 | House | posted in committee |
2013-02-06 | House | to State Government (H) |
2013-02-05 | House | introduced in House |