KY HB245 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 64.090 to allow sheriffs to charge no more than $50 for executing writs of possession instead of a set amount of $7.
Title
AN ACT relating to sheriffs' fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 111 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-02-22 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 |
2019-02-21 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 22, 2019 |
2019-02-21 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-20 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2019-02-14 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-07 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2019-02-06 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Counties
Courts
Courts, District
Landlord and Tenant
Local Government
Peace Officers and Law Enforcement
Sheriffs
Courts
Courts, District
Landlord and Tenant
Local Government
Peace Officers and Law Enforcement
Sheriffs