KY HB269 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS 82.600 to 82.640 to allow cities, urban-county governments, and consolidated local governments, through the passage of an ordinance, to receive goods for transfer to nonprofit charities, service organizations, and local government projects or programs serving the public in lieu either in whole or in part of civil fines assessed against parking violations.
Title
AN ACT relating to local government parking citation enforcement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 67 (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-02-04 | House | 3rd reading, passed 90-4 |
2020-02-03 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 4, 2020 |
2020-01-30 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-01-29 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-01-24 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-17 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2020-01-15 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Charitable Organizations and Institutions
Cities
Consolidated Local Governments
Counties, Urban
Local Government
Motor Vehicles
Transportation
Cities
Consolidated Local Governments
Counties, Urban
Local Government
Motor Vehicles
Transportation