KY HB391 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 97)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 97)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 381, relating to condominiums and the Uniform Condominium Act; define relevant terms; provide requirements and procedures for establishment of associations and for the conduct of business; establish rights and responsibilities of unit owners; provide criteria related to the sale of units by unit owners and collection of delinquent fees and assessments; establish procedure for distribution of proceeds as related to common elements; provide for the short title, "Kentucky Condominium Act"; provide that this Act becomes effective January 1, 2011.
Title
AN ACT relating to condominiums.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-08 | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 97) | |
2010-03-29 | delivered to Governor | |
2010-03-29 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | |
2010-03-29 | passed 98-0 | |
2010-03-29 | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute, floor amendment (1) | |
2010-03-24 | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute, floor amendment (1) | |
2010-03-19 | to Rules (H) | |
2010-03-19 | received in House | |
2010-03-18 | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute, floor amendment (1) | |
2010-03-17 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 18, 2010 | |
2010-03-12 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-03-11 | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute | |
2010-03-11 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2010-03-01 | to Judiciary (S) | |
2010-02-25 | received in Senate | |
2010-02-24 | 3rd reading, passed 98-0 with Committee Substitute | |
2010-02-18 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 24, 2010 | |
2010-02-18 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-02-17 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2010-02-12 | posted in committee | |
2010-02-08 | to Judiciary (H) | |
2010-02-05 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB391.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB391/bill.doc |