KY HB391 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-22 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-22 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 171 to establish the Books for Brains Program to promote the development of a comprehensive statewide program for encouraging preschool children to develop an appreciation of books; attach the program to the Department for Libraries and Archives for administrative purposes; establish a governing board of seven members appointed by the Governor for staggered four year terms; establish Books for Brains Program trust fund to consist of funds collected through state appropriations, gifts, grants, and any other funds from the public and private sectors; direct the department to promulgate administrative regulations to establish the procedures for working with local partners to provide books for registered children; APPROPRIATION.
Title
AN ACT relating to books for preschool children and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Rep. Melvin Henley [D] | Rep. Charles Miller [D] | Rep. Tom Riner [D] | Rep. Fitz Steele [D] |
Rep. John Tilley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-22 | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2012-02-22 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-02-21 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2012-02-15 | posted in committee | |
2012-02-13 | to Education (H) | |
2012-02-10 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB391.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB391/bill.doc |