KY HB478 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-06 - became law without Governor's Signature
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-06 - became law without Governor's Signature
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 224.40-120 to allow an off-site construction or demolition waste disposal permittee to request an increase in the size of the permitted area to no more than two acres total if the applicant is compliant with the permit requirements for the currently permitted area and complies with all permit requirements for the newly permitted area, including posting an additional bond for the newly permitted area.
Title
AN ACT relating to construction or demolition waste disposal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 3034 (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 212 (Y: 75 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 212 (Y: 75 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-06 | House | became law without Governor's Signature |
2024-04-05 | House | filed without Governor's signature with the Secretary of State |
2024-03-25 | House | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-25 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-25 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-25 | House | received in House |
2024-03-22 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 32-6 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 22, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-03-13 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-03-08 | Senate | to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-03-05 | House | 3rd reading, passed 75-19 |
2024-03-01 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 04, 2024 |
2024-03-01 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-02-29 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-02-23 | House | to Natural Resources & Energy (H) |
2024-02-07 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-02-07 | House | introduced in House |