KY HB551 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 65 to allow law enforcement agencies to contract with retired peace officers to assist with homicide cold cases.
Title
AN ACT relating to cold cases.
Sponsors
Rep. Keturah Herron [D] | Rep. John Blanton [R] | Rep. George Brown [D] | Rep. Beverly Chester-Burton [D] |
Rep. Rachel Roberts [D] | Rep. Sarah Stalker [D] | Rep. Pamela Stevenson [D] | Rep. Lisa Willner [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 3187 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 317 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 317 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | signed by Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-28 | House | received in House |
2024-03-28 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 28, 2024 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules as a consent bill |
2024-03-27 | Senate | returned to Judiciary (S) |
2024-03-27 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2024-03-27 | Senate | taken from Judiciary (S) |
2024-03-26 | Senate | returned to Judiciary (S) |
2024-03-26 | Senate | 1st reading |
2024-03-26 | Senate | taken from Judiciary (S) |
2024-03-25 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2024-03-22 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-03-22 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-03-21 | House | 3rd reading, passed 98-0 |
2024-03-15 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 21, 2024 |
2024-03-15 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-03-14 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-03-13 | House | to State Government (H) |
2024-02-14 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-02-14 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Contracts
Crimes and Punishments
Local Government
Peace Officers and Law Enforcement
Police, City and County
Crimes and Punishments
Local Government
Peace Officers and Law Enforcement
Police, City and County