KY HB83 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-08 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-08 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 186 to require a law enforcement agency to enter a stolen item with a vehicle identification number into the NCIC database.
Title
AN ACT relating to the reporting of stolen items with vehicle identification numbers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-08 | to Judiciary (S) | |
2010-02-04 | received in Senate | |
2010-02-03 | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 | |
2010-01-27 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 3, 2010 | |
2010-01-27 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-01-26 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2010-01-22 | posted in committee | |
2010-01-05 | to Transportation (H) | |
2010-01-05 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB83.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB83/bill.doc |