KY HCR4 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - received in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Urge the United States Department of Interior, the United States Department of Agriculture, the United States Department of Defense, and the United States Congress to consider ways to improve communications infrastructure, such as granting leasehold interests in federal land for the location of cell phone towers and other communication infrastructure in Kentucky.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the federal government to consider leasing federal land for the location of cell phone towers and other communication infrastructure in Kentucky.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 152 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27Senatereceived in Senate
2019-02-26House3rd reading, passed 99-0
2019-02-25Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 26, 2019
2019-02-22House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-21Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2019-02-11Houseposted in committee
2019-01-10Houseto Natural Resources & Energy (H)
2019-01-08Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback