KY SB132 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-10 - posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 11, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-10 - posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 11, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 160 to allow a superintendent to select the principal in a school identified as an initial intervention school or, with local board approval, choose other intervention options; define initial intervention school; direct the Kentucky Board of Education to promulgate regulations to establish the process and procedures for implementing the intervention options.
Title
AN ACT relating to improving school and student performance.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Seum [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-10 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 11, 2015 |
2015-03-09 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2015-03-09 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2015-03-03 | House | posting waived |
2015-03-03 | House | posted in committee |
2015-03-03 | House | returned to Education (H) |
2015-03-03 | House | 1st reading |
2015-03-03 | House | taken from Education (H) |
2015-02-23 | House | to Education (H) |
2015-02-12 | House | received in House |
2015-02-12 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 28-6 with Committee Substitute |
2015-02-12 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 12, 2015 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute |
2015-02-11 | Senate | returned to Education (S) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2015-02-11 | Senate | taken from Education (S) |
2015-02-10 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2015-02-10 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2015-02-10 | Senate | 1st reading |
2015-02-10 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2015-02-06 | Senate | introduced in Senate |