KY SB153 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - recommitted to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - recommitted to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 413.249 to remove the statute of limitations for civil actions arising from childhood sexual assault or abuse; to provide that every civil action arising from childhood sexual assault or abuse be accompanied by a motion to seal the record.
Title
AN ACT relating to childhood sexual assault or abuse.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | Senate | recommitted to Judiciary (S) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | taken from the Regular Orders of the Day |
2022-03-02 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2022-03-01 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2022-02-28 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2022-02-25 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2022-02-23 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 25, 2022 |
2022-02-18 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-02-17 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-02-10 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/22RS/sb153.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/22RS/sb153/orig_bill.pdf |