KY SB169 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-25 - returned to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-25 - returned to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 161.430 to require investment managers and consultants of the Teachers' Retirement Systems to adhere to the federal Investment Advisers Act of 1940, as amended, and any other federal securities statutes as applicable; make conforming and clean-up changes to the section; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Teachers' Retirement System and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2019-02-25 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | 1st reading |
2019-02-22 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/19RS/sb169.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/sb169/orig_bill.pdf |