KY SB184 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 14A.1-070 to add a nonprofit business which is at least 51 percent unconditionally controlled by a veteran to the definition of "veteran-owned business"; amend KRS 14A.2-060 and KRS 14A.2-165 to conform.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to veteran-owned nonprofit businesses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 892 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12Housereturned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2019-03-12House2nd reading
2019-03-12Housetaken from Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2019-03-07Housereturned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2019-03-07House1st reading
2019-03-07Housetaken from Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2019-03-01Houseto Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2019-02-28Housereceived in House
2019-02-28Senate3rd reading, passed 37-0
2019-02-28Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 28, 2019
2019-02-27Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-26Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2019-02-15Senateto Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2019-02-13Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback