KY SB212 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-12 - returned to Committee on Committees (H)
Pending: House Committee On Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-12 - returned to Committee on Committees (H)
Pending: House Committee On Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 61.542 and 161.480 to require effective September 1, 2021, that any future changes to beneficiary designations for all members shall be submitted to the systems electronically or by an electronic method developed by the systems; amend KRS 61.526 and 161.480 to require effective July 1, 2022, that new member forms, including beneficiary designation forms, shall be submitted to the systems electronically or by an electronic method developed by the systems;
Title
AN ACT relating to the submission of member forms prior to retirement with the state-administered retirement systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa1 RSN# 1629 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-12 | House | returned to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-03-12 | House | 2nd reading |
2021-03-12 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-03-11 | House | returned to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-03-11 | House | 1st reading |
2021-03-11 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-03-04 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-03-04 | House | received in House |
2021-03-03 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-2 with floor amendment (1) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2021-03-02 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2021-03-02 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 3, 2021 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-01 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2021-02-10 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2021-02-09 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-02-09 | Senate | introduced in Senate |