KY SB3 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-25 - 3rd reading, defeated 21-0-16 with floor amendments (1) and (2)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-25 - 3rd reading, defeated 21-0-16 with floor amendments (1) and (2)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Propose to create a new section of the Constitution of Kentucky, adopting a 21st Century Bill of Rights; claim sovereignty under the Tenth Amendment to the Constitution of the United States; establish that no law or rule shall compel certain persons to participate in health care systems, provide abortion services, surrender their firearms, or prevent the severing of coal, or the posting of the Ten Commandments, or actions motivated by a sincerely held religious belief; establish that governmental agencies should promote the use of Kentucky coal and make public information available on the Internet, and that the General Assembly provide a reasonable period of time for public review and comment on any appropriation or revenue measure.
Title
AN ACT proposing to create a new section of the Constitution of Kentucky, adopting a 21st Century Bill of Rights.
Sponsors
Sen. John Schickel [R] | Sen. Dan Seum [R] | Sen. Brandon Smith [R] | Sen. Damon Thayer [R] |
Sen. Elizabeth Tori [R] | Sen. Jack Westwood [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-25 | 3rd reading, defeated 21-0-16 with floor amendments (1) and (2) | |
2010-01-25 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, January 25, 2010 | |
2010-01-22 | floor amendments (1) and (2) filed | |
2010-01-20 | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-01-19 | to State & Local Government (S) | |
2010-01-19 | 1st reading | |
2010-01-19 | taken from committee | |
2010-01-19 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/SB3.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/SB3/bill.doc |