KY SB55 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-20 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 035)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-20 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 035)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 217 to define "not-for-profit organization" "take" and "wildlife"; prohibit state and local government entities from restricting the donation of game meat to or from not-for-profit organizations for the purpose of free meal distribution; require that the game meat be from wildlife that was taken in the Commonwealth, properly field dressed and processed, and apparently disease-free and unspoiled.
Title
AN ACT relating to the donation of game meat.
Sponsors
Sen. Robin Webb [D] | Sen. C.B. Embry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-20 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 035) |
2015-03-10 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2015-03-10 | Senate | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2015-03-04 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-03-04 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 |
2015-02-27 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 2, 2015 |
2015-02-27 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-26 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2015-02-24 | House | posted in committee |
2015-02-11 | House | to Natural Resources & Environment (H) |
2015-02-10 | House | received in House |
2015-02-10 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 |
2015-02-10 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 10, 2015 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-04 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2015-02-03 | Senate | to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2015-01-06 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/SB55.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/SB55/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/SB55/vote_history.pdf |