KY SB70 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 183)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 508 to create the crime of strangulation, provide that strangulation is a Class D felony; amend KRS 403.720 to include the offense of strangulation as one of the offenses considered domestic violence and abuse; amend KRS 456.010 to include the offense of strangulation as one of the offenses considered dating violence and abuse; amend KRS 456.020 to conform.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to strangulation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1060 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 337 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1 RSN# 800 (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26Senatesigned by Governor (KY Acts ch. 183)
2019-03-14Senatedelivered to Governor
2019-03-14Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-03-14Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-03-14SenateBill passed 35-1
2019-03-14SenateSenate concurred in House floor amendment (3)
2019-03-14Senateposted for passage for concurrence in House floor amendment (3)
2019-03-14Senatereceived in Senate
2019-03-14House3rd reading, passed 96-0 with floor amendment (3)
2019-03-06Housefloor amendment (3) filed
2019-02-22Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 25, 2019
2019-02-21Housefloor amendments (1) and (2) filed
2019-02-21House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-20Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2019-02-15Houseposted in committee
2019-02-14Houseto Judiciary (H)
2019-02-13Housereceived in House
2019-02-13Senate3rd reading, passed 31-4 with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-02-13Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 13, 2019
2019-02-08Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-07Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-01-11Senateto Judiciary (S)
2019-01-09Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/19RS/sb70.html
Texthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/sb70/orig_bill.pdf
Texthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/sb70/bill.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/SB70/SCS1.pdf
Supplementhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/19RS/sb70/SCS1CI.pdf
Supplementhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/19RS/sb70/SCS1LM.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/SB70/HFA1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/SB70/HFA2.pdf
Supplementhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/19RS/sb70/LM.pdf
Supplementhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/19RS/sb70/CI.pdf
Roll Callhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/19RS/sb70/vote_history.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback