KY SCR149 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - received in House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - received in House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Request that the Education Professional Standards Board conduct a study on a uniform vocational teacher ranking system and submit a report with recommendations to the Interim Joint Committee on Education by December 1, 2019.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION requesting the Education Professional Standards Board to conduct a study on the vocational teacher rank system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 969 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | House | received in House |
2019-03-13 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-03-07 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2019-03-04 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | introduced in Senate |