KY SR257 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Honor Reed Sheppard, the Southeastern Conference's Freshman of the Year in men's basketball for 2024.
Title
A RESOLUTION honoring Reed Sheppard, the Southeastern Conference's Freshman of the Year in men's basketball for 2024.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 3259 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-12 | Senate | adopted by voice vote |
2024-03-27 | Senate | to Senate Floor |
2024-03-25 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-03-25 | Senate | introduced in Senate |