LA HB185 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Local & Municipal Affairs Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 1:00 pm in Room F
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Local & Municipal Affairs Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 1:00 pm in Room F
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for creation of Castle Manor Security and Improvement District in New Orleans
Title
Provides for creation of Castle Manor Security and Improvement District in New Orleans
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - House - House Vote on HB 185 FINAL PASSAGE (#293) (Y: 82 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-04 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 82, nays 14. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/04/2024. |
2024-04-03 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-02 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). |
2024-03-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2024-03-12 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2024-03-11 | House | Prefiled. To be introduced at a later date. |
2024-02-26 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2024-02-26 | House | Prefiled. |