LA HB193 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-04 - Withdrawn from the files of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-04 - Withdrawn from the files of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for drug testing requirements for recipients of cash assistance in the Family Independence Temporary Assistance Program
Title
Provides for drug testing requirements for recipients of cash assistance in the Family Independence Temporary Assistance Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-04 | House | Withdrawn from the files of the House. |
2020-05-04 | House | Discharged from the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2020-03-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2020-02-24 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/24/2020. |
2020-02-24 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2020-02-24 | House | Prefiled. |