LA HB2 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-30 - Effective date: 05/30/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-30 - Effective date: 05/30/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the comprehensive Capital Outlay budget
Title
Provides for the comprehensive Capital Outlay budget
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-19 - House - House Vote on HB 2 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1000) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 2 FINAL PASSAGE (#720) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - House - House Vote on HB 2 FINAL PASSAGE (#411) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 2 FINAL PASSAGE (#720) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - House - House Vote on HB 2 FINAL PASSAGE (#411) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-30 | House | Effective date: 05/30/2022. |
2022-05-30 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 117. |
2022-05-20 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/20/2022. |
2022-05-20 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-05-19 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2022-05-19 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2022-05-18 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/19/2022. |
2022-05-18 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-15 | Senate | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Senate Committee amendments read and adopted. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-04-21 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-04-20 | House | Made Special Order of the day No. 1 for 04/21/2022. |
2022-04-20 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered rereengrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-04-20 | House | Rules suspended. |
2022-04-20 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0). |
2022-04-19 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2022-04-18 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0) with recommendation to recommit to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2022-04-12 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2022-04-11 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2022-03-23 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2022-03-22 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |