LA HB259 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Revenue & Fiscal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Revenue & Fiscal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Reduces the severance tax rate for oil over a certain period of time and specifies the severance tax rate for oil produced from certain wells (EG DECREASE GF RV See Note)
Title
Reduces the severance tax rate for oil over a certain period of time and specifies the severance tax rate for oil produced from certain wells (EG DECREASE GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-25 - House - House Vote on HB 259 FINAL PASSAGE (#77) (Y: 88 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-03-25 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 12. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-03-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/25/2024. |
2024-03-21 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-03-20 | House | Reported favorably (15-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2024-02-27 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2024-02-27 | House | Prefiled. |