LA HB284 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 9:00 am in Room C
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 9:00 am in Room C
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the Louisiana Agricultural Finance Authority
Title
Provides relative to the Louisiana Agricultural Finance Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - House - House Vote on HB 284 FINAL PASSAGE (#570) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-17 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/17/2024. |
2024-04-15 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-11 | House | Reported favorably (10-0-1). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |
2024-02-28 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |
2024-02-28 | House | Prefiled. |