LA HB37 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective date: August 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective date: August 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes a blood type designation to be included on the front of a person's driver's license or special identification card (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG EX See Note)
Title
Authorizes a blood type designation to be included on the front of a person's driver's license or special identification card (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG EX See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Terry Brown [I] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-10 - House - House Vote on HB 37 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1061) (Y: 77 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 37 ADOPT (#1058) (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - House Vote on HB 37 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#920) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 37 FINAL PASSAGE (#795) (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - House Vote on HB 37 FINAL PASSAGE (#47) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 37 ADOPT (#1058) (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - House Vote on HB 37 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#920) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 37 FINAL PASSAGE (#795) (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - House Vote on HB 37 FINAL PASSAGE (#47) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | House | Effective date: August 1, 2015. |
2015-07-01 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 369. |
2015-06-12 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2015-06-11 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-06-10 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 2 nays. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2015-06-10 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 77, nays 14. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2015-06-10 | House | Rules suspended. |
2015-06-10 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2015-06-09 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Riser, Claitor, and Adley. |
2015-06-09 | House | House conferees appointed: Brown, St. Germain, and Howard. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2015-06-09 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 91, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2015-06-07 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/09/2015. |
2015-06-07 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 4 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Senate Committee amendments read and adopted. |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2015-04-27 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2015-04-22 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/27/2015. |
2015-04-22 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-04-21 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). |
2015-04-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2015-02-27 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/27/2015. |
2015-02-23 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2015-02-23 | House | Prefiled. |