LA HB405 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 30 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Signed by the President of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 30 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Signed by the President of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Re-creates the Department of Revenue (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Re-creates the Department of Revenue (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 405 FINAL PASSAGE (#434) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - House - House Vote on HB 405 FINAL PASSAGE (#53) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - House - House Vote on HB 405 FINAL PASSAGE (#53) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-04-30 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-04-30 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-03-20 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-03-19 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/20/2024. |
2024-03-19 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-03-18 | House | Reported favorably (16-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2024-02-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2024-02-29 | House | Prefiled. |